judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9171
A-9171
07/31/1962
Application for Writ of Error
DR. AND MRS. COLEMAN JACOBSON, MR. AND MRS. ALFRED BLOOM, MR. AND MRS. WALTER H. CASH, MR. AND MRS. CHARLES CHAPMAN, MR. AND MRS. RICHARD M. FROST AND MR AND MRS. RALPH GRAHAM, ET AL.
PRESTON FOREST SHOPPING CENTER, INC., BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT OF CITY OF DALLAS AND GEORGE E. MIXON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/25/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/04/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/04/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/31/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/02/1962Response to Motion filed
10/25/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/04/1962Reply to Response
09/04/1962Response to Petition
07/31/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/31/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. and Mrs. Coleman Jacobson, Mr. and Mrs. Alfred Bloom, Mr. and Mrs. Walter H. Cash, Mr. and Mrs. Charles Chapman, Mr. and Mrs. Richard M. Frost and Mr and Mrs. Ralph Graham, et al.Petitioner
Preston Forest Shopping Center, Inc., Board of Adjustment of City of Dallas and George E. Mixon, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information