judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHEELER VS. NAVON

Case Information: 36334
Short Caption:WHEELER VS. NAVONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A395664Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/10/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Autos America). Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10708
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Ronald Wheeler) 00-10710
06/22/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Requeting Record. "The appeal by Autos America, Inc., is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction." The appeal may proceed with Ronald Wheeler as the sole appellant. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original record pertaining to this appeal. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-12033
08/10/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 00-13978
08/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On July 24, 2000, appellant submitted a Dismissal of Appeal. We construe the document as a motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal pursuant to NRAP 42(b) and grant the motion. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[The document was also signed by Susan Wheeler, purportedly on behalf of Autos America, Inc., a corporation. The appeal by the corporation was dismissed by order dated July 13, 2000.] fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We note that appellant has failed to pay the filing fee required by NRS 2.250; this constitutes an independent basis for dismissing this appeal.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-14430
08/18/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
08/18/2000RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned record on appeal this day. 00-14461
09/07/2000RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on August 22, 2000. 00-14461