judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JUAN CEJA, a/k/a JONATHAN ISRAEL ALMADA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0180)
Case Number:S-08-0180Case Docketed On:08/19/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:JUAN CEJA, a/k/a JONATHAN ISRAEL ALMADA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JUAN CEJA, a/k/a JONATHAN ISRAEL ALMADA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJuan CejaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 71
Citation:208 P.3d 66 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/06/2008Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
10/06/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion to stay briefingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/04/2008Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
11/06/2008Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter addressed to Chief Justice Voigt indicating the transcripts have been filed and requesting that his brief be due on November 10, 2008.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/06/2008Order - Lifting Stay and setting briefing scheduleOrderLifting StayFinal
11/10/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/13/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential File; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal