judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9183
A-9183
08/02/1962
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHEAST TEXAS CHAPTER OF NATIONAL ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, ET AL., PFEIFFER ELECTRIC COMPANY
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/30/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/17/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/05/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/06/1962Reply to Response
11/06/1962Response to Motion filed
10/30/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/17/1962Reply to Response
09/05/1962Response to Petition
08/20/1962Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
08/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/02/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasRespondent
Pfeiffer Electric CompanyPetitioner
Southeast Texas Chapter of National Electrical Contractors Association, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information