judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9182
A-9182
08/06/1962
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
THOMAS H. CROFTS, DISTRICT JUDGE OF THE 86TH SUPREME JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF TEXAS, ET AL.
ANITA D. AUTRY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/17/1962Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
08/20/1962Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1962Order from Lower Court filed
11/14/1962Dissenting opinion issued.
11/14/1962Opinion issued
10/17/1962Supplemental Brief filed
08/20/1962Order from Lower Court filed
08/20/1962Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
08/13/1962Response to Motion filed
08/06/1962Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anita D. AutryRespondent
Thomas H. Crofts, District Judge of the 86th Supreme Judicial District of Texas, et al.Relator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information