judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9191
A-9191
08/09/1962
Application for Writ of Error
UNITED GAS PIPE LINE COMPANY
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ALAMO GAS SUPPLY COMPANY, CITY PUBLIC SERVICE BOARD OF SAN ANTONIO, AND CITY OF SAN ANTONIO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/25/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/28/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/24/1962Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/11/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/09/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/14/1962Response to Motion filed
12/04/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/25/1962Response to Brief filed
09/28/1962Reply to Response
09/24/1962Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/11/1962Response to Petition
08/09/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/09/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LONE STAR GAS COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Railroad Commission of Texas, Alamo Gas Supply Company, City Public Service Board of San Antonio, and City of San AntonioRespondent
UNITED GAS PIPE LINE COMPANYPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information