Case Information: 36340 | |||
Short Caption: | RENO AIRPORT FIREFIGHTERS VS. AIRPORT AUTHORITY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0001535 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/06/2000 / Manoukian, Noel | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/23/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Walter Bruce Robb--check no. 2631 ($100) and no. 2633 ($100). | ||
06/23/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-10772 | |
07/06/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
11/08/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 00-19650 | |
01/08/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (NRAP 42(b)). | 01-00351 | |
01/29/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the joint motion for voluntary dismissal filed on January 8, 2001, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK | 01-01850 | |
01/29/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |