judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERTA ELIZABETH MADRID v. JOHN DAVID MADRID

Case Heading (S-08-0193)
Case Number:S-08-0193Case Docketed On:08/29/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ROBERTA ELIZABETH MADRID v. JOHN DAVID MADRID
Full Title:ROBERTA ELIZABETH MADRID, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JOHN DAVID MADRID, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoberta Elizabeth MadridRonald G. Pretty
AppelleeJohn David MadridDameione Shaw Cameron

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/29/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received [Received Notice of Appeal but no appendix per W.R.A.P. 2.07(b)]Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
08/29/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/29/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appeal [no appendix as required per W.R.A.P. 2.07(b)]OrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
09/09/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
09/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received, but not filed. Advised runner that we would hold and file after e-filing of motionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
09/18/2008Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/18/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/18/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal