judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

E. SCOTT FRISON V. RONDA NUNNALLY

Case Information: 10-CV-1363
Short Caption:E. SCOTT FRISON V. RONDA NUNNALLYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3769-09Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/25/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantE. Scott Frison, Jr.NPro SeN
AppelleeRonda Nunnally NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/10/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/15/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellee's misc motion - appellant's motion to file (LODGED) oppo
12/20/2010APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION TO REDACT OR SEAL THE RECORD LW
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION
01/18/2011RECEIVED - aplt's oppo to motion to redact.
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO LATE FILE OPPOSITION IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged opposition to the motion to redact or seal. It is *****MORE*****
02/28/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION
02/28/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
02/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the orde on appeal is hereby AFFIRMED. (GLTHTE) (jl)
02/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the MOTION TO REDACT OR SEAL THE RECORD IS DENIED AS MOOT. (GLTHTE) (jl)
03/10/2011APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
03/22/2011ORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING and it apprg that this court's jmt filed on Feb. 28, 2011, affirmed the order on appeal and denied aple's motion to redact or seal the record as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee may re-file the motion to redact or seal the record in the trial court. (GL,TH,TE)
04/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED