judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YUN K. HAN V. S.E. ACADEMY OF SCHOLASTIC EXCELLENCE, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1364
Short Caption:YUN K. HAN V. S.E. ACADEMY OF SCHOLASTIC EXCELLENCE, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR2747-08Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantYun K. Han N
Jason A. PardoYY
Russell S. DrazinNY
AppelleeSoutheast Academy of Scholastic ExcellenceN
Michael N. Russo, Jr.NY
Michael S. Steadman, Jr.YY
AppelleeFriendship Public Charter SchoolN
William C. CasanoYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 29, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
11/19/2010RECORD INDEX
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before February 2, 2011. (JAC) elp
02/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/02/2011APPENDIX- aplt's vol. I-4
03/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Southeast & Adams National Bank) attorney: Michael Steadman no oppo to 3/18/11
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' briefs shall be filed on or before March 18, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (Friendship Public Charter School)
03/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (S.E. Academy of Excellence Public Charter School, Wells Fargo Bank, NA and Adams National bank)
03/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/18/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee Southeast Academy of Scholastic Excellence)
07/27/2011LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/11/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte removing from the Regular Calendar of September 20, 2011
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/25/2011FiledArgued Before Fisher,Thompson,Nebeker Jason A.Pardo Esq.,for appellant Michael S.Steadman Esq.,for appellee
12/01/2011FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the grant of summary judgment is affirmed)
12/23/2011FiledMandate