judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEBORAH McGARVEY v. KEY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, and BICENTENNIAL VILLAGE ASSOCIATES LLC

Case Heading (S-08-0194)
Case Number:S-08-0194Case Docketed On:09/02/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:DEBORAH McGARVEY v. KEY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, and BICENTENNIAL VILLAGE ASSOCIATES LLC
Full Title:DEBORAH McGARVEY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KEY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, and BICENTENNIAL VILLAGE ASSOCIATES LLC, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDeborah McGarveyTimothy Charles Kingston
AppelleeKey Property Mangement LLCKathleen Baker Dixon
Patrick Dixon
AppelleeBicentennial Village Associates LLCKathleen Baker Dixon
Patrick Dixon

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Federal, Constitutional Law - Wyoming, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 84
Citation:211 P.3d 503

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/02/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/17/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/25/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/26/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellees.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Timothy Kingston for appellant; Patrick Dixon for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Timothy Kingston for appellant; Patrick Dixon for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/19/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/01/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/17/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/20/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal