judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOE B. SAVELLE v. TEXAS BOARD OF LAW EXAMINERS

Case: B-1398
B-1398
02/27/1969
Direct Appeal
JOE B. SAVELLE
TEXAS BOARD OF LAW EXAMINERS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/17/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/27/1969Direct Appeal filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/17/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/02/1969Order from Lower Court filed
03/24/1969Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
03/21/1969Response to Motion filed
03/11/1969Miscellaneous Motion
02/27/1969Direct Appeal filed
02/27/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Board of Law ExaminersRespondent
Joe B. SavellePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information