judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2630
A-2630
04/03/1950
Application for Writ of Error
FRED HILL
JOHN N. DAVIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/18/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/25/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/25/1950Response to Motion filed
05/18/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/25/1950Response to Petition
04/10/1950Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
04/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/03/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John N. DavisRespondent
Fred HillPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information