judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2135
A-2135
03/21/1949
Application for Writ of Error
ARTHUR S. DILLIEY, ET UX.
CITY OF HOUSTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/07/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/18/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/26/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
03/21/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/13/1949Additional Copies received
07/07/1949Motion for Rehearing
05/18/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/13/1949Document received (See Remarks)
04/13/1949Document received (See Remarks)
03/26/1949Response to Petition
03/21/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walter E. BoydAmicus Curiae
Arthur S. Dilliey, et ux.Petitioner
City of HoustonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information