judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2780
A-2780
03/30/1950
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT C. SINGER, JR.
MARIAM C. SINGER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/26/1951Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/18/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/10/1951Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/08/1950Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/30/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/30/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/15/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/28/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
02/28/1951Opinion issued
01/26/1951Response to Brief filed
01/18/1951Brief on the Merits
01/10/1951Brief on the Merits
11/16/1950Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
10/26/1950Letter Filed
10/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
07/08/1950Response to Petition
06/30/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/30/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/30/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mariam C. SingerRespondent
Robert C. Singer, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information