judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9095
A-9095
06/25/1962
Application for Writ of Error
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
IKE GLENN, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/09/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/22/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/14/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/13/1962Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/14/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
08/13/1962Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/03/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/28/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/25/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/25/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/31/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/10/1962Response to Motion filed
10/09/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/22/1962Reply to Response
09/14/1962Response to Brief filed
09/13/1962Brief in Support of Petition
08/14/1962Response to Brief filed
08/13/1962Supplemental Brief filed
07/03/1962Response to Brief filed
06/28/1962Reply to Response
06/25/1962Response to Petition
06/25/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/25/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANYPetitioner
Ike Glenn, Jr.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information