judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9081
A-9081
06/15/1962
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
RAMON A. BENAVIDEZ AND 32 BOTTLES OF BEER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/29/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/15/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/19/1963Letter Filed
02/06/1963Opinion issued
07/18/1962Document received (See Remarks)
06/29/1962Response to Petition
06/15/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/15/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasPetitioner
Ramon A. Benavidez and 32 Bottles of BeerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information