judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9086
A-9086
06/18/1962
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
BAKER BROS. NURSERY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/07/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/26/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/18/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/19/1963Response to Motion filed
03/07/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/20/1963Opinion issued
10/29/1962Motion to Strike filed
10/26/1962Response to Petition
10/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
06/18/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/18/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Baker Bros. NurseryRespondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information