judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9118
A-9118
07/06/1962
Application for Writ of Error
CAPITAL NATIONAL BANK IN AUSTIN, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF CHAS. A. MCCORMICK
MILLER RHOADES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/19/1962Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
12/06/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/06/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/02/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/23/1962Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/19/1962Brief in Support of Petition
12/06/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/02/1962Response to Petition
07/23/1962Response to Petition
07/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/06/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Capital National Bank in Austin, Independent Executor of the Estate of Chas. A. McCormickPetitioner
Miller RhoadesRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information