judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ABRAHAM (SAMUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36336
Short Caption:ABRAHAM (SAMUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109706Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/28/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10716
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36313, 36332, 36336, 36338, 36343, 36374, 36396. Document No. 00-13561.
11/28/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 7. Mailed on: 11/22/00. 00-20689
11/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn4[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20436
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20767
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20767