judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLOYD STRICKLAND v. MICHAEL J. MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming Department of Corrections, State of Wyoming

Case Heading (S-08-0182)
Case Number:S-08-0182Case Docketed On:08/21/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Habeas Corpus
Short Title:FLOYD STRICKLAND v. MICHAEL J. MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming Department of Corrections, State of Wyoming
Full Title:FLOYD STRICKLAND, Petitioner, v. MICHAEL J. MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming Department of Corrections, State of Wyoming, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerFloyd Strickland Pro Se
RespondentMichael J. MurphyBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/21/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/21/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/21/2008Petition - Writ - habeas corpusPetitionWrit - habeas corpusFinal
08/21/2008Memorandum - In support of petition for writ habeas corpus (affidavit)MemorandumIn support of petitionFinal
09/04/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion to dismiss petition for writ of habeas corpusEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2008Order - Petition for review - deny (Appendix discarded)OrderPetition for review - denyFinal
09/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/01/2008Event - Deficient pleading returned - returned petition for reinstatement of petition for writ of habeas corpus. Case closed.EventDeficient pleading returnedFinal