judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JINHEE KIM WILDE

Case Information: 10-BG-1351
Short Caption:IN RE: JINHEE KIM WILDEClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN244-09Filed Date:11/02/2010

Opening Event Date:11/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/16/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Julia L. PorterYY
Hamilton P. FoxNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
James T. PhalenNY
Robert C. Bernius NN
RespondentJinhee Kim Wilde N
Kevin B. Bedell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/02/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of a judgment of conviction and the English translation thereof entered against respondent. The judgment was entered on August 28, 2009, by the Incheon District Court in Incheon, Korea, which found respondent guilty of theft for stealing $1,100 in U.S. Currency from Erica Yeong Zee Chang, while on a flight from the United States to Korea.
11/04/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with the English version of the articles of the Korean Criminal Act cited in the Judgment against respondent.
11/10/2010LETTER from counsel for respondent regarding an opposition to the imposition of the proposed reciprocal discipline.
11/15/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION to request for immediate suspension.
11/19/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to respondent's opposition to request for immediate susupension.
01/12/2011ORDER On consideration of Bar Counsel's petition to temporarily suspend respondent from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pursuant to D.C> Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c) pending resolution of this matter, respondent's letter dated November 9, 2010, respondent's opposition to request of immediate suspension, and Bar Counsel's response, and it appearing that respondent was found guilty by the Incheon District Court in Incheon, Korea, of theft for stealing $1,100 in U.S. Currency from Erica Yeong Chang; the court having received a certified copy of the Judgment; and it appearing that the offense constitutes a serious crime as defined by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (b), it is ORDERED that Bar Counsel's petition is granted, and it is pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c), that the respondent, Jinhee Kim Wilde, is suspended immediately from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending resolution of this matter, and the Board on Professional Responsibility is directed to institute a formal proceeding to determine the nature of the offense and whether it involves moral turpitude within the meaning of D.C. Code Sec 11-2503(a)(2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirements of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement based on conpliance with Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (KR,OB,FA).
01/26/2011AFFIDAVIT of respondent pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g)).
05/19/2011RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to lift suspension and terminate proceedings.
05/25/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for an extension of time to file a response to respondent's motion to lift suspension and terminate proceedings. (unopposed)
05/31/2011ORDER On consideration of Bar Counsel's unopposed motion for an extension of time in which to file a response to respondent's motion to lift suspension and terminate proceedings, it is ORDERED that Bar Counsel's motion is granted and Bar Counsel's response whall be filed on or about June 7, 2011. (JAC)
06/07/2011PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION (Bar Counsel)
06/14/2011REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. that the court reconsider its order suspending respondent under D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 10 (c), based on her conviction of a serious crime and referring the conviction to the Board for a moral turpitude determination, and that it find that respondent was not convicted of a crime within the meaning of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 10 (a). If the court reconsider its order, the Board further recommends that respondent's conviction be referred to Bar Counsel to proceed in accordance with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 8.
06/24/2011PETITIONER'S EXCEPTIONS (Bar Counsel)
06/29/2011BD. ON PROF. RESP. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (Unopposed)
08/09/2011FiledBriefing Order - ORDERED that the motion of the Board on Professional Responsibility for leave to file brief is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of Bar Counsel (an original and three copies) shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, respondent may file a brief within 30 days from the date Bar Counsel files its brief, and the Board's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (JAC)
09/19/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
09/20/2011FiledReceived an ameded certificate of service for Bar Counsel's brief. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
10/07/2011FiledTMC/JANUARY 12, 2011 SUSPENSION ORDER.../RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO LIFT SUSPENSION.../OPPOSITION OF BAR COUNSEL/BOARD'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION
10/14/2011FiledOrder - ORDERED that respondent's motion is denied as the motion fails to provide a basis for relief under D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 10 (g)(2011). It is FURTHER ORDERED, sua sponte, that in light of questions raised by the Board on Professional Responsibity in its report and recommendation, the January 12, 2011 suspension order is hereby lifted pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 10 (c). (WH,OB,FA)
10/17/2011FiledReceived Bar Counsel's supplemental exhibit to Bar Counsel's brief in support of exceptions to report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
10/19/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
11/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File brief (unopposed). (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
11/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file the Board's brief on or before December 16, 2011. FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel's request to extend the time in which to file Bar Counsel's reply brief within 30 days from the date the Board files its brief. (JAC)
12/16/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
12/16/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/16/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
01/17/2012FiledReply Brief (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/15/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
02/27/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Supplemental) (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/05/2012FiledMotion of the Board on Professional Responsibility to extend the time for oral argument (unopposed) (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)Granted
04/06/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Respondent)
04/12/2012FiledOrder Granting petitioner consent motion for additional argument time.
04/17/2012LodgedReceived errata to the brief of the Board on Professional Responsibility. (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
04/19/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Belson
09/18/2012FiledBriefing Order
09/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File parties supplemental briefs. (Joint) (Petitioner Bar Counsel, Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility, Respondent Wilde)
09/25/2012FiledOrder Granting joint motion for an extension to file supplemental briefs.
10/25/2012FiledSupplemental Brief (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
10/25/2012FiledSupplemental Brief (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
10/25/2012FiledSupplemental Brief (Respondent)
10/31/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to unril November 7, 2012, to File the Board's, Bar Counsel's and Respondent's responsive briefs. (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
11/06/2012FiledLetter From the Board on Professional Responsibility advising the court that the Board has decided not to file a responsive brief in this matter. (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
11/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File the parties reply brief. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
11/21/2012FiledOrder Granting joint motion to file the respnsive briefs of Bar Counsel and the respondent.
11/21/2012FiledReceived Supplemental Brief (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
11/21/2012FiledReceived supplemental brief (Respondent)
06/20/2013FiledDismissed - ORDERED that the disciplinary action against respondent under D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 10 (a), No. 10-BG-1351, be dismissed, without prejudice to Bar Counsel's initiating proceedings regarding respondent pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 8. (GL,BR,BE)