judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9098
A-9098
06/27/1962
Application for Writ of Error
W. C. HENGER, SAM P. WALLACE AND ROBERT E. MOORE
LEWIS A. SALE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF BACHMAN CENTER CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/07/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/21/1962Supplement to Petition filedRespondent
07/28/1962Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/12/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/27/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/27/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/1963Response to Motion filed
03/07/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/20/1963Opinion issued
10/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
08/21/1962Supplement to Petition filed
07/28/1962Response to Petition
07/12/1962Response to Petition
06/27/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/27/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/27/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. C. Henger, Sam P. Wallace and Robert E. MoorePetitioner
Lewis A. Sale, for the Benefit of Bachman Center CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information