judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9136
A-9136
07/16/1962
Application for Writ of Error
TRAVIS- WILLIAMSON COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
GLOBE INDEMNITY COMPANY, HOLLAND PAGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/11/1963Response to Brief filedPetitioner
03/04/1963Post submission brief filedRespondent
02/27/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
08/27/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/30/1962Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/30/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/30/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/27/1963Letter Filed
05/08/1963Opinion issued
03/11/1963Response to Brief filed
03/04/1963Post submission brief filed
02/27/1963Response to Petition
02/14/1963Motion to supplement filed
02/11/1963Response to Petition
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
08/27/1962Response to Petition
07/30/1962Response to Petition
07/30/1962Response to Petition
07/30/1962Response to Petition
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/16/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Travis- Williamson County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1Petitioner
Globe Indemnity CompanyRespondent
Holland PageRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information