judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9124
A-9124
07/10/1962
Application for Writ of Error
CREWS WELL SERVICE
TEXAS COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/31/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/16/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/22/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
08/07/1962Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/10/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/31/1962Reply to Response
10/22/1962Response to Motion filed
10/16/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/03/1962Opinion issued
08/22/1962Response to Brief filed
08/07/1962Supplemental Brief filed
07/10/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/10/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Crews Well ServicePetitioner
Texas CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information