judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9121
A-9121
07/10/1962
Application for Writ of Error
LOWER NUECES RIVER WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT
NATALIE M.COLLINS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/21/1962Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/07/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/08/1962Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/12/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/23/1962Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/10/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/10/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/21/1962Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
11/07/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/08/1962Reply to Response
09/12/1962Response to Petition
09/07/1962Response to Motion filed
08/15/1962Motion to dismiss
07/23/1962Response to Petition
07/10/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/10/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/10/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Natalie M.Collins, et al.Respondent
Lower Nueces River Water Supply DistrictPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information