judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERNANDEZ (JAVIER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36335
Short Caption:HERNANDEZ (JAVIER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR992212Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10711
07/18/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Eric Nickel shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-12391
07/31/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: April 10, 2000. Court Reporter: D. Davidson. Filed in district court on: July 25, 2000. 00-13174
08/10/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 00-13974
08/31/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15362
09/06/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 00-15643
09/15/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-16338
09/15/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-16339
09/27/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17095
10/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming and Remanding for Entry of Corrected Judgment. "We affirm appellant's convictions . . . we remand this matter to the district court for the sole purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction consistent with this order." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-19029
11/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19417
11/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/08/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2000. 00-19417