judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9113
A-9113
07/05/1962
Application for Writ of Error
CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY
JOHN G. STREET, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/21/1962Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/09/1962Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/09/1962Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/02/1962Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/19/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/09/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/05/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/30/1963Opinion issued
11/21/1962Supplemental Brief filed
11/09/1962Brief on the Merits
11/09/1962Reply to Response
11/02/1962Response to Petition
07/19/1962Response to Petition
07/09/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/05/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/05/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John G. Street, Jr.Respondent
Continental Casualty CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information