judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9045
A-9045
05/24/1962
Application for Writ of Error
SPENCE AND HOWE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
GULF OIL CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/03/1962Post submission brief filedRespondent
06/13/1962Supplement to ResponseRespondent
06/08/1962Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/04/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
05/24/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/06/1963Opinion issued
12/03/1962Post submission brief filed
10/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
06/13/1962Supplement to Response
06/08/1962Supplemental Brief filed
06/04/1962Response to Petition
05/24/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Spence and Howe Construction CompanyPetitioner
Gulf Oil Corporation Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information