judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9066
A-9066
06/06/1962
Application for Writ of Error
OHIO OIL COMPANY
DARRELL SMITH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/28/1962Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/05/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
07/05/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
06/08/1962Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/06/1963Opinion issued
10/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/03/1962Document received (See Remarks)
09/28/1962Supplemental Brief filed
07/05/1962Response to Petition
07/05/1962Response to Petition
06/08/1962Brief in Support of Petition
06/06/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/06/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ohio Oil CompanyPetitioner
Darrell SmithRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information