judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6474
B-6474
01/07/1977
Application for Writ of Error
MOST REV. THOMAS J. DRURY, ESTATE OF STELLA T. LYTTON, ET AL., CLARA STARK TOLAND, ET AL., RAUL TREVINO, ET AL., ALICE NATIONAL BANK, ET AL., LEE H. LYTTON, JR. AND ARTHUR L. LYTTON, JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS
PATRICK A. TRUCOTTE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/24/1978Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/17/1978Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/04/1978Errata FiledPetitioner
03/27/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/31/1977Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/19/1977Post submission brief filedPetitioner
10/19/1977Post submission brief filedPetitioner
10/19/1977Post submission brief filedPetitioner
10/03/1977Letter brief Respondent
09/28/1977Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
03/10/1977Letter brief Petitioner
03/09/1977Supplement to ResponseRespondent
02/24/1977Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/21/1977Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/04/1977Letter brief Petitioner
01/26/1977Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/25/1977Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/25/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
01/25/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/25/1978Motion for emergency stay filedFiling granted
04/24/1978Response to Brief filed
04/17/1978Supplemental Brief filed
04/04/1978Errata Filed
04/03/1978Response to Motion filed
04/03/1978Response to Motion filed
04/03/1978Response to Motion filed
03/31/1978Response to Motion filed
03/27/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/15/1978Dissenting opinion issued.
03/15/1978Opinion issued
10/31/1977Response to Brief filed
10/19/1977Post submission brief filed
10/19/1977Post submission brief filed
10/19/1977Post submission brief filed
10/03/1977Letter brief
09/28/1977Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/17/1977Letter Filed
08/17/1977Miscellaneous Motion
08/11/1977Letter Filed
08/10/1977Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarks
07/15/1977Letter Filed
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/10/1977Letter brief
03/09/1977Supplement to Response
02/24/1977Response to Brief filed
02/21/1977Supplemental Brief filed
02/04/1977Letter brief
01/26/1977Response to Petition
01/25/1977Motion to dismiss
01/25/1977Response to Petition
01/25/1977Response to Petition
01/25/1977Response to Petition
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/07/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/07/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Patrick A. Trucotte, et al.Respondent
Raul Trevino, et al.Petitioner
Alice National Bank, et al.Petitioner
John L. Hill, Attorney General of TexasPetitioner
Estate of Stella T. Lytton, et al.Petitioner
Most Rev. Thomas J. DruryPetitioner
Lee H. Lytton, Jr. and Arthur L. LyttonPetitioner
Clara Stark Toland, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information