judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOE B. OWEN AND MORRIS B. PARKER v. MARVIN A. BROWN, DBA BROWN SERVICE CO.

Case: B-1408
B-1408
03/03/1969
Application for Writ of Error
JOE B. OWEN AND MORRIS B. PARKER
MARVIN A. BROWN, DBA BROWN SERVICE CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/28/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/06/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/29/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/30/1969Amended PetitionRespondent
03/18/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/10/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
03/03/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/28/1969Motion for Rehearing
11/06/1969Reply to Response
11/03/1969Response to Motion filed
10/29/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/15/1969Opinion issued
06/23/1969Supersedeas Bond
06/23/1969Miscellaneous Motion
06/11/1969Opinion issued
04/30/1969Amended PetitionFiling granted
04/28/1969Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
03/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/18/1969Response to Petition
03/10/1969Response to Petition
03/03/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/03/1969Conditional application for writ of error filed
03/03/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe B. Owen and Morris B. ParkerPetitioner
Marvin A. Brown, dba Brown Service Co.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information