judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SELLS (WILLIAM) VS. STATE C/W 33994, 34062

Case Information: 31265
Short Caption:SELLS (WILLIAM) VS. STATE C/W 33994, 34062Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:31265*, 33994 , 34062 Related Case(s): 33994 , 34062 , 35758 , 38115 , 44513 , 47013 , 54064 , 58062 , 68960 , 68960-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C106554Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/28/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
11/05/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Re: Records on appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31206, 31208, 31211, 31217, 31265, 31267.
03/16/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5.
03/16/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/09/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. Letter with various documents attached. (Received the original only).
02/01/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Statement of Appellant for Court's Consideration.
02/01/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Notice of Change of Address.
05/03/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Affidavit of: William Cato Sells Jr., in Relationship to Arrest of April 10, 1992. (Received the original only).
11/02/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Appointment of Counsel for Appeal. (Received the original and one copy-no copy returned).
04/13/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal. (Received the original and two copies-1 copy returned).
05/01/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal. (Received the original and two copies-1 copy returned).
12/04/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML Nos. 31265, 33994, 34062. 00-21135
02/26/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML Nos. 31265/33994/34062. 01-03497
03/14/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03702
03/14/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03702