judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9034
A-9034
05/17/1962
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN R. VEAL
ORKIN EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/02/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/25/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
05/17/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/25/1962Letter Filed
06/02/1962Reply to Response
05/25/1962Response to Petition
05/17/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/17/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Orkin Exterminating Company, IncorporatedRespondent
John R. VealPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information