judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9050
A-9050
05/25/1962
Application for Writ of Error
TOM VICK TIRADO
MERLE LEWIS TIRADO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/17/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/20/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/01/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1962Response to Motion filed
10/17/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/20/1962Reply to Response
06/01/1962Response to Petition
05/25/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/25/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tom Vick TiradoPetitioner
Merle Lewis TiradoRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information