judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6707
B-6707
01/04/1977
Application for Writ of Error
BRISTOL-MYERS COMPANY
RAMON GONZALES, DR. RUFINO GONZALEZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/21/1977Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/21/1977Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/28/1977Post submission brief filedPetitioner
11/28/1977Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/10/1977Response to PetitionPetitioner
05/09/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
04/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/03/1978Response to Motion filed
02/15/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/01/1978Opinion issued
12/21/1977Response to Brief filed
12/21/1977Response to Brief filed
12/05/1977Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
12/02/1977Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
11/28/1977Post submission brief filed
11/28/1977Supplemental Brief filed
11/14/1977Miscellaneous MotionDenied
11/14/1977Miscellaneous MotionDenied
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1977Response to Petition
05/09/1977Response to Petition
04/26/1977Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
04/26/1977Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
04/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/15/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/15/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/04/1977Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. Rufino GonzalezRespondent
Ramon GonzalesRespondent
Bristol-Myers CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information