judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-10825
A-10825
05/30/1962
MISC PETITION
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA, CROWN CENTRAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION AND POCANTICO OIL AND GAS CORP., RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
WOODS EXPLORATION AND PRODUCING COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/24/1966Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/15/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/09/1965Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/18/1965Response to Brief filed
10/05/1965Appellees' Brief filedIntervenor
10/04/1965Appellees' Brief filed
08/16/1965Appellant's Brief filed
06/14/1965Reply to Response
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/24/1966Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/15/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/09/1965Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/18/1965Response to Brief filed
10/05/1965Appellees' Brief filed
10/04/1965Appellees' Brief filed
08/16/1965Appellant's Brief filed
07/07/1965Miscellaneous Motion
06/14/1965Reply to Response
06/11/1965Response to Motion filed
06/10/1965Miscellaneous Motion
06/08/1965Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
05/30/1962Order from Lower Court filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Woods Exploration and Producing Company, Inc., et al.Appellee
Ben Novak and Lumar Gas CorporationIntervenor
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellant
Houston Natural Gas Corporation and Houston Pipe Line CompanyAmicus Curiae
Texas AFL-CIOAmicus Curiae
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Appellant
Southwestern Chemical and Gas CorporationAmicus Curiae
Norman J. BeringAmicus Curiae
Aluminum Company of America, Crown Central Petroleum Corporation and Pocantico Oil and Gas Corp.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information