judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EICON VS. CAMPBELL

Case Information: 31269
Short Caption:EICON VS. CAMPBELLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A364021Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/30/1997 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/27/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/28/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Government.
10/28/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
10/30/1997Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/14/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/21/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. A follow-up report will be submitted shortly.
11/22/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/15/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
02/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve the transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request, or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned.
03/03/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.
03/13/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Amending Caption.
03/16/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The clerk shall modify the caption appearing on this court's docket consistent with the caption appearing on this order. (Caption and case cards modified.)
04/17/2000BriefFiled Brief. Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/14/00.)
04/17/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2.
05/15/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent may have to and including June 14, 2000, within which to file the Answering Brief.
06/14/2000MotionFiled Stipulation.
06/15/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. On June 14, 2000, the parties filed a second stipulation for an extension of time to file the Answering Brief. The stipulation is treated as an unopposed motion. Respondent's Answering Brief shall be served on or before July 14, 2000.
07/17/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 7/14/00.
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-21262
12/05/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/27/2001Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel: SNP01A-CY/ML/NB.
07/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11732
08/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11973
08/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11973