judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID R. COLYER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-08-0183)
Case Number:S-08-0183Case Docketed On:08/22/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:DAVID R. COLYER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:DAVID R. COLYER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid R. ColyerVance Tyler Countryman
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Michael Thomas Kahler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI, Indian Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 43
Citation:203 P.3d 1104

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/22/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/22/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/06/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee, Wyoming Department of TransportationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/03/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/12/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/15/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/21/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/25/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/10/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal