Case Information: 10-CV-1354 | |||
Short Caption: | RON JOLLES V. MARGARET BOND, ET AL | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB3043-10 | Filed Date: | 11/04/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/04/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/15/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/10/2010 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Ron Jolles | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Margaret Bond | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Joe Bond | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
11/04/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
11/04/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL and/or, in the alternative, for stay pending appeal and expepedited hearing | |||
11/05/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (99-pgs/graybill 10/1/10 proc) | |||
11/05/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (52-pgs/tape 10/1/10 proc.) | |||
11/05/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (43-pgs/coney 10/5/10 proc.)w/cd | |||
11/09/2010 | TMC - motion for summary reversal OR for stay - motion for summary affirmance AND sanctions AND oppo | |||
11/12/2010 | APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and sanctions and opposition to aplt's mot for stay. | |||
11/15/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
11/15/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
11/17/2010 | APPELLANT'S REPLY to aple's cross-motion for Summary affirmance, and aplt's oppo to aple's motion for sanctions. | |||
11/19/2010 | ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc., 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979). It is *****MORE***** | |||
11/19/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. supra....SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S REQUESTS TO STAY the October 5, 2010 order AND for EXPEDITED REVIEW ARE DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES' REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. See DC App. R. 38. It is *****MORE***** | |||
11/19/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal be and hereby IS AFFIRMED. (RDBRNW) (rl) | |||
12/10/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
04/17/2014 | Filed | Archived |