judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2261
A-2261
05/27/1949
Application for Writ of Error
JACK CARTER, ET AL.
HOMER TOMLINSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/21/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/09/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/10/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/04/1949Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/01/1949Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/14/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
05/27/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/21/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/13/1950Response to Motion filed
03/09/1950Additional Copies received
03/09/1950Motion for Rehearing
02/22/1950Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered
02/22/1950Opinion issued
11/10/1949Reply to Response
11/04/1949Response to Brief filed
11/01/1949Supplemental Brief filed
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
06/17/1949Additional Copies received
06/14/1949Response to Petition
05/27/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/27/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jack Carter, et al.Petitioner
Homer Tomlinson, et al.Respondent
Horace Blalock, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information