judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2225
A-2225
05/09/1949
Application for Writ of Error
SAM BAGNALL
JAMES B. BAGNALL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/20/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/08/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/16/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/25/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
05/09/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1950Response to Motion filed
12/20/1949Motion for Rehearing
12/17/1949Response to Motion filed
12/12/1949Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing
12/07/1949Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
11/14/1949Response to Motion filed
11/08/1949Motion for Rehearing
10/26/1949Dissenting opinion issued.
10/26/1949Opinion issued
06/16/1949Brief on the Merits
05/25/1949Response to Petition
05/25/1949Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sam BagnallPetitioner
James B. BagnallRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information