judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2220
A-2220
05/06/1949
MISC PETITION
MACO STEWART, ET AL.
HON. BEN RAMSEY, SECRETARY OF STATE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/13/1949Supplemental Brief filedRelator
06/28/1949Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/18/1949Motion for Rehearing
10/05/1949Opinion issued
07/13/1949Supplemental Brief filed
06/28/1949Supplemental Brief filed
05/20/1949Response to Motion filed
05/06/1949Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Maco Stewart, et al.Relator
Hon. Ben Ramsey, Secretary of StateRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information