judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PERKINS (MARVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36338
Short Caption:PERKINS (MARVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 57100 , 67732
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C063505Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/01/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/23/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/23/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10767
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36313, 36332, 36336, 36338, 36343, 36374, 36396. Document No. 00-13561.
12/01/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-20959
12/01/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-21270
01/15/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00565
01/15/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00565