judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOUIS ALPHONSO SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1361
Short Caption:LOUIS ALPHONSO SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-7070-07Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/15/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/30/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLouis Alphonso Smith Y
Marc L. ResnickYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/01/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mark Resnick, Esquire
11/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 29, 2010, and it ap pearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that Mark Resnick, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to November 1, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
11/23/2010RECORD INDEX
11/23/2010RECORD COPIES
11/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/02/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/11/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
02/15/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/15/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/12/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/30/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/30/2011SUBMITTED before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Fisher and Farrell
07/14/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
08/05/2011FiledMandate