judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2275
A-2275
06/06/1949
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
ANEETH P. LURIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/16/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
06/06/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/06/1949Motion for Rehearing
11/23/1949Opinion issued
10/05/1949Additional Copies received
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
06/16/1949Response to Petition
06/06/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of HoustonPetitioner
Aneeth P. LurieRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information