judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

M. D. COLLINS, ET UX. v. R. V. MIZE, ET AL.

Case: B-1404
B-1404
02/28/1969
Application for Writ of Error
M. D. COLLINS, ET UX.
R. V. MIZE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/17/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/28/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/19/1969Opinion issued
09/08/1969Reply to Response
07/16/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/17/1969Response to Petition
02/28/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/28/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. V. Mize, et al.Respondent
M. D. Collins, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information