judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2246
A-2246
05/17/1949
Application for Writ of Error
PROVIDENT LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY
ALVIN H. CONNELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/09/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/11/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/15/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
05/17/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/17/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/09/1950Letter Filed
11/09/1949Motion for Rehearing
07/11/1949Reply to Response
06/15/1949Response to Petition
06/15/1949Document received (See Remarks)
06/15/1949Document received (See Remarks)
05/17/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/17/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alvin H. ConnellRespondent
Provident Life and Accident Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information