judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00415-CR
04-89-00415-CR
08/28/1989
Other Felony
Silva, Ben
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/15/1991Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
01/15/1991Mandate received by the trial court
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
10/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/05/1990Submitted
07/05/1990Submission
07/05/1990Submitted
06/04/1990Submission
05/07/1990Case ready to be set
05/07/1990Brief Filed
05/07/1990Case ready to be set
05/02/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/26/1990No Description Available.
04/20/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/12/1990No Description Available.
04/12/1990No Description Available.
03/19/1990Brief Filed
02/23/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/16/1990No Description Available.
12/05/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/01/1989No Description Available.
10/11/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989No Description Available.
09/11/1989No Description Available.
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/26/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/14/1991Case StoredCase stored
01/14/2016RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
25th Judicial District Court
Guadalupe
Honorable B. B. Schraub
88-12-1378CR
10 years TDC