judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01007-CV
05-89-01007-CV
08/28/1989
Mandamus
Wood, Elliott L.
Glenn R. Snyder, Judge, County Court at Law 2, Dallas County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/17/1989Record RetentionDestroy
09/20/1989Motion to Extend Time to File WritMotion or Writ Denied
08/28/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/28/1989Motion to Stay
08/28/1989Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/28/1989MattConv
08/28/1989Motion for Leave to File
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/28/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Glen R. Snyder
CC86-18617-B